AZ HB2199 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State contracts; participation goals; veterans
Title
State contracts; participation goals; veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-08 | House Consent Calendar March 08, 2010 @ 3:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-18 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |