AZ HB2197 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Charter schools; age restricted communities
Title
Charter schools; age restricted communities
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] |
Rep. John Fillmore [R] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-05 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-4-2-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consent Calendar March 07, 2011 @ 1:25 PM | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House third reading , voting: (50-10-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |