AZ HB2179 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Municipalities; counties; intergovernmental agreements; requirements
Title
Municipalities; counties; intergovernmental agreements; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |