AZ HB2157 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1184
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations; community-based services
Title
Supplemental appropriations; community-based services
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion HB 2157 substituted for SB 1184. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Motion Carter motion that the House, still having possession of HB 2157, rescind its action of Thursday, February 17, 2022, whereby it passed HB2157 on Third Reading of Bills and that HB2157 be placed again under the order of business Third Reading of Bil (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Motion Carter motion that the House, still having possession of HB 2157, rescind its action of Thursday, February 17, 2022, whereby it passed HB2157 on Third Reading of Bills and that HB2157 be placed again under the order of business Third Reading of Bil (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion HB 2157 substituted for SB 1184. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Motion Carter motion that the House, still having possession of HB 2157, rescind its action of Thursday, February 17, 2022, whereby it passed HB2157 on Third Reading of Bills and that HB2157 be placed again under the order of business Third Reading of Bil (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - Motion Carter motion that the House, still having possession of HB 2157, rescind its action of Thursday, February 17, 2022, whereby it passed HB2157 on Third Reading of Bills and that HB2157 be placed again under the order of business Third Reading of Bil (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Chapter 2 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2157 substituted for SB 1184. Motion carried. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-19-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Carter motion that the House, still having possession of HB 2157, rescind its action of Thursday, February 17, 2022, whereby it passed HB2157 on Third Reading of Bills and that HB2157 be placed again under the order of business Third Reading of Bills for today. |
2022-02-17 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0) |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Replaces) 2022-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System) (s)
Appropriations
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs) (s)
Children's Health Insurance Program (s)
Community-based Services
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety) (s)
Department Of Child Safety (dcs) (s)
Department Of Economic Security (des) (s)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security) (s)
Exemption (s)
Reports (s)
Supplemental Appropriation
Appropriations
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs) (s)
Children's Health Insurance Program (s)
Community-based Services
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety) (s)
Department Of Child Safety (dcs) (s)
Department Of Economic Security (des) (s)
Des (see Also: Department Of Economic Security) (s)
Exemption (s)
Reports (s)
Supplemental Appropriation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 511.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |