AZ HB2130 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Municipalities; counties; energy use; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities; counties; energy use; reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14 Chapter 27
2016-03-14 Governor Signed
2016-03-14 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-14HouseHouse final reading , voting: (35-23-2-0)
2016-03-14HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-03-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-10SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0)
2016-03-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-03-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-22SenateSenate WE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Senate WE Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate WE Committee
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-10HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-10HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2016-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0)
2016-01-19HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-01-27HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2016-01-20HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2016-01-20HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-19HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2016-01-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2130
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0027.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2130petersen.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2130commerce.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.2130rul.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130.hcom.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130.swe.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2130.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback