AZ HB2128 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mine inspector; mine safety; appropriation
Title
Mine inspector; mine safety; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefile |