AZ HB2123 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board of technical registration; registrants
Title
Board of technical registration; registrants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0) |
2014-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |