AZ HB2120 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 368
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; injuries; medical-only loss
Title
Workers' compensation; injuries; medical-only loss
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 368 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | House Conference adopted |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2022-06-15 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2022-06-01 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments and the bill be further amended. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference members: MESNARD, PETERSEN, TERÁN |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2022-05-18 | House | House Conference members: KAISER, MEZA, WILMETH |
2022-05-18 | House | House Conference appointed |
2022-05-16 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-16 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Injuries (s)
Injury Reports
Labor - Title 23
Medical Treatment
Medical-only Loss (s)
Workers' Compensation
Injury Reports
Labor - Title 23
Medical Treatment
Medical-only Loss (s)
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 963.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |