AZ HB2116 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ambulance services; rates; AHCCCS members
Title
Ambulance services; rates; AHCCCS members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | House final reading , voting: (52-3-5-0) | |
2010-04-14 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-0-4-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-30 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-30 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-3-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-17 | House third reading , voting: (49-8-3-0) | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-01-13 | House read second time | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in House and read first time |