AZ HB2114 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Peace officers; weapons; federal facilities
Title
Peace officers; weapons; federal facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |