AZ HB2110 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; risk retention groups
Title
Insurance; risk retention groups
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-12 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Consent Calendar March 07, 2011 @ 1:25 PM | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-08 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-31 | House Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:23 PM | |
2011-02-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |