AZ HB2107 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmacies; practices; pharmacy benefits managers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies; practices; pharmacy benefits managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 133
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2018-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-15HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69803
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2107p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2107h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0133.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2107syms.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.2107cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.2107health.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69803&billStatusActionId=181346&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69803&billStatusActionId=181413&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69803&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69803&billStatusActionId=182810&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback