AZ HB2085 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1095
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate; employees; rent collection
Title
Real estate; employees; rent collection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion HB 2085 substituted for SB 1095. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion HB 2085 substituted for SB 1095. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Chapter 10 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2085 substituted for SB 1095. Motion carried. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-19 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1095 (Replaces) 2021-02-02 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Subjects
Definitions
Employees
Licenses
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifications
Real Estate
Rent Collection
Sales
Employees
Licenses
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifications
Real Estate
Rent Collection
Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |