AZ HB2084 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
International boundary wall; building permits
Title
International boundary wall; building permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-01-30 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-01-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House FR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House FR Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 325 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |