AZ HB2078 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Counties; elections; state audits
Title
Counties; elections; state audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 605 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 606 | New Code | See Bill Text |