AZ HB2078 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1021
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Groundwater; waterlogged area exemption; date
Title
Groundwater; waterlogged area exemption; date
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Motion HB 2078 substituted for SB 1021. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Motion HB 2078 substituted for SB 1021. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Chapter 4 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2078 substituted for SB 1021. Motion carried. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-12 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefile |
Same As/Similar To
SB1021 (Replaces) 2021-01-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Subjects
Date
Exemption
Groundwater
Groundwater Code
Irrigation
Irrigation And Water Conservation Districts
Waterlogged Area
Waters - Title 45
Withdrawal
Exemption
Groundwater
Groundwater Code
Irrigation
Irrigation And Water Conservation Districts
Waterlogged Area
Waters - Title 45
Withdrawal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 411.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |