AZ HB2078 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Office of tourism; continuation
Title
Office of tourism; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (51-9-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-13 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House third reading , voting: (49-9-2-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |