AZ HB2076 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Court fees; digital evidence; storage
Title
Court fees; digital evidence; storage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Aggravated Assault
Assault
Classification
Court Fees
Courts
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Digital Evidence
Justice And Municipal Courts - Title 22
Probation Officers
Resisting Arrest
Storage
Assault
Classification
Court Fees
Courts
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Digital Evidence
Justice And Municipal Courts - Title 22
Probation Officers
Resisting Arrest
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 284.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 284.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
22 | 282 | New Code | See Bill Text |