AZ HB2072 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; State Route 95; repaving
Title
Appropriation; State Route 95; repaving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-18-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefile |