AZ HB2070 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-19 - Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-19 - Referred to Senate APPROP Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeland security; committee; force
Title
Homeland security; committee; force
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | House third reading , voting: (40-19-1-0) | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |