AZ HB2065 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public meetings; definition; penalties
Title
Public meetings; definition; penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 229 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-11 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-2-2-0) |
2018-04-11 | House | House concurs |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-10 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-2-3-0) |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-01 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 431 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 431.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 431.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |