AZ HB2041 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health; voluntary evaluations; payment
Title
Mental health; voluntary evaluations; payment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 545.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |