AZ HB2039 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional community colleges; accreditation; oversight
Title
Provisional community colleges; accreditation; oversight
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Chapter 84 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (53-0-6-0) |
2024-04-02 | House | House concurs |
2024-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2024-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-01-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-0-0) |
2024-01-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-01-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-08 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Accreditation
Alternative Organization (s)
Community College Districts
Definition (s)
Education - Title 15
Emergency
Emergency Clause (s)
Oversight
Provisional Community Colleges
Alternative Organization (s)
Community College Districts
Definition (s)
Education - Title 15
Emergency
Emergency Clause (s)
Oversight
Provisional Community Colleges