AZ HB2022 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water; report; fees; levee
Title
Water; report; fees; levee
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 166 |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-12 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2023-06-12 | House | House concurs |
2023-06-12 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-12 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2023-05-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Adwr (see Also: Department Of Water Resources)
Annual Report
Department Of Water Resources (adwr)
Emergency (s)
Emergency Clause (s)
Exemption From Rulemaking (s)
Fee Reduction (s)
Fees (s)
Levee (s)
Report (s)
Water (s)
Water Resources
Waters - Title 45
Annual Report
Department Of Water Resources (adwr)
Emergency (s)
Emergency Clause (s)
Exemption From Rulemaking (s)
Fee Reduction (s)
Fees (s)
Levee (s)
Report (s)
Water (s)
Water Resources
Waters - Title 45