AZ HB2015 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School employees; statements; employer discipline
Title
School employees; statements; employer discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Education - Title 15
Penalties
Political Activities
Political Beliefs
Religious Beliefs
School Districts
School Employees
Education - Title 15
Penalties
Political Activities
Political Beliefs
Religious Beliefs
School Districts
School Employees