AZ HB2001 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Credit for donation
Title
Credit for donation
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-05-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2021-05-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-2-1-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Agriculture - Title 3
Agriculture Protection Act
Credit For Donation
False Claims
Income Tax
Purpose
Retroactivity
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Technical Correction
Agriculture Protection Act
Credit For Donation
False Claims
Income Tax
Purpose
Retroactivity
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Technical Correction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1089.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1181 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |