AR SJR3 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Reviewed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Reviewed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Applying To The United States Congress To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution.
Title
Applying To The United States Congress To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reviewed by the Governor |
2019-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The vote by which SJR3 Passed was expunged. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Motion for the Clincher was withdrawn |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Motion for the Clincher |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-02-13 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-01-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |