AR SCR7 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage The Pursuit Of National Cancer Institute Designation By The Winthrop P. Rockefeller Cancer Institute At The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences.
Title
To Encourage The Pursuit Of National Cancer Institute Designation By The Winthrop P. Rockefeller Cancer Institute At The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned From the House as concurred in. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To Senate concurred in. |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=scr7&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SCR7/SCR7022520211059.pdf |