AR SB925 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Notification that SB925 is now Act 864
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Notification that SB925 is now Act 864
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Exempt Out-of-state Businesses And Their Employees From Certain Taxes And Regulatory Requirements During A Disaster Response Period; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Exempt Out-of-state Businesses And Their Employees From Certain Taxes And Regulatory Requirements During A Disaster Response Period; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Notification that SB925 is now Act 864 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-24 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |