AR SB5 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Waiver Of A Person's Or Entity's Right To A Jury Trial That Is Conditioned On A Contractual Agreement Of The Parties; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning The Waiver Of A Person's Or Entity's Right To A Jury Trial That Is Conditioned On A Contractual Agreement Of The Parties; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Notification that SB5 is now Act 13 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2018-03-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-15 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2018-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2018-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2018-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The vote by which the Emergency Clause failed was expunged |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Filed |