AR SB480 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that SB480 is now Act 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that SB480 is now Act 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Purpose Of The Statutes Authorizing A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun; And To Clarify That A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun Is Not Required To Carry A Concealed Handgun In This State.
Title
To Clarify The Purpose Of The Statutes Authorizing A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun; And To Clarify That A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun Is Not Required To Carry A Concealed Handgun In This State.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB480 is now Act 777 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed |