AR SB473 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that SB473 is now Act 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that SB473 is now Act 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Public School Employee Professional Or Labor Organizations.
Title
Concerning Public School Employee Professional Or Labor Organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 37 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 37 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB473 is now Act 776 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Motion by Rep. Wardlaw to reconsider SB473 passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-30 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Filed |