AR SB469 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that SB469 is now Act 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Notification that SB469 is now Act 775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Reduce Violent Crime In Arkansas; To Establish The Violent Crime Clearance Grant Fund; To Provide Law Enforcement Agencies With Resources To Combat Violent Crime; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Reduce Violent Crime In Arkansas; To Establish The Violent Crime Clearance Grant Fund; To Provide Law Enforcement Agencies With Resources To Combat Violent Crime; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB469 is now Act 775 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Filed |