AR SB38 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That Applicants For And Recipients Of Unemployment Benefits Be Tested For Illegal Drug Use.
Title
To Require That Applicants For And Recipients Of Unemployment Benefits Be Tested For Illegal Drug Use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Filed |