AR SB309 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB309 is now Act 779
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Requirements For Coverage For Colorectal Cancer Screening.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Requirements For Coverage For Colorectal Cancer Screening.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateNotification that SB309 is now Act 779
2021-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-15SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2021-04-06SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-04-06SenateReturned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-04-06HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-01HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-31HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-03-23HouseRe-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2021-03-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-15SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2021-03-02SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-03-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-02-09SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb309&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB309/SB309020920211329.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB309/SB309030220211003.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB309/SB309031520211332.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB309/SB309040120211332.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=779.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB309-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB309-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB309-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB309&rcs=2343&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB309&rcs=2683&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB309&rcs=2803&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback