AR SB308 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Disbursing Officer Reappropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-05-17HouseReturned to the Senate.
2013-05-17HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-02-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-02-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-02-28SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-02-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-02-28SenateRules suspended.
2013-02-28SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-02-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-02-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback