AR SB182 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law To Allow For More Options In The Levying And Collection Of Fire Dues.
Title
To Amend The Law To Allow For More Options In The Levying And Collection Of Fire Dues.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |