AR SB133 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Senate Notification that SB133 is now Act 641
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Senate Notification that SB133 is now Act 641
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Rural Services Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Rural Services Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Senate Notification that SB133 is now Act 641 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-22 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned From the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-21 | House Returned To Senate as Passed. | |
2011-03-21 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-21 | House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-03-21 | House RULES SUSPENDED | |
2011-03-18 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-18 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-18 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-03-15 | House Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | |
2011-03-14 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2011-03-14 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Filed |