AR SB110 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB110 is now Act 876
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB110 is now Act 876
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Notification that SB110 is now Act 876 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2019-04-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2019-04-05 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2019-04-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2019-04-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |