AR HR1043 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
In Support Of The Alzheimer's Association; And To Recognize Advocacy Day 2015 At The Arkansas State Capitol.
Title
In Support Of The Alzheimer's Association; And To Recognize Advocacy Day 2015 At The Arkansas State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1043 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1043.pdf |