AR HR1028 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Commend Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., For Its Service Work And Contributions To Its Communities; And To Designate March 12, 2015, As Alpha Kappa Alpha Day At The Arkansas State Capitol.
Title
To Commend Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., For Its Service Work And Contributions To Its Communities; And To Designate March 12, 2015, As Alpha Kappa Alpha Day At The Arkansas State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1028 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1028.pdf |