AR HR1002 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.
Title
To Authorize The Introduction Of A Nonappropriation Bill To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - READ AND ADOPTED. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2016-04-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2016-04-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2016-03-24 | House | Filed |