AR HCR1013 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Congratulate The Batesville High School Lady Pioneers For Their Achievements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Congratulate The Batesville High School Lady Pioneers For Their Achievements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-28HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-03-28SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2019-03-28SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-03-26SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-26HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback