AR HCR1011 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Recognize The Positive Contribution Of The Filming Of Hbo Series “true Detective” In Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Recognize The Positive Contribution Of The Filming Of Hbo Series “true Detective” In Arkansas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-01HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2019-04-01SenateReturned to the House as concurred in as amended.
2019-04-01SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2019-03-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-27HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback