AR HB1988 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - House Notification that HB1988 is now Act 895
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - House Notification that HB1988 is now Act 895
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Creation Of Regional Economic Development Partnerships; To Regulate Regional Economic Development Partnerships; And To Regulate The Funding Of Regional Economic Development Partnerships.
Title
To Authorize The Creation Of Regional Economic Development Partnerships; To Regulate Regional Economic Development Partnerships; And To Regulate The Funding Of Regional Economic Development Partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | House Notification that HB1988 is now Act 895 | |
2011-03-30 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-30 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-18 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-16 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-15 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-15 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |