AR HB1954 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-04 - Notification that HB1954 is now Act 1068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-04 - Notification that HB1954 is now Act 1068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The State Of Arkansas Workforce Retention Task Force; To Study And Evaluate The Ways State Agencies Could Increase Employee Retention; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create The State Of Arkansas Workforce Retention Task Force; To Study And Evaluate The Ways State Agencies Could Increase Employee Retention; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Walker [D] | Sen. Joyce Elliott [D] | Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D] | Rep. George McGill [D] |
Sen. Jon Woods [R] | Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D] | Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Rep. Chris Richey [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1954 is now Act 1068 |
2015-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-20 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |