AR HB1909 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that HB1909 is now Act 919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that HB1909 is now Act 919
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Limitations On Access To A Cultivation Facility.
Title
To Amend The Limitations On Access To A Cultivation Facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Notification that HB1909 is now Act 919 |
2021-04-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-21 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-04-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2021-04-12 | House | Filed |