AR HB1880 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-04 - Notification that HB1880 is now Act 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-04 - Notification that HB1880 is now Act 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Improvement Districts.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Improvement Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1880 is now Act 1043 |
2015-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-30 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-09 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |