AR HB1817 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt Federal Law Concerning Income Tax Deductions For Depreciation And The Expensing Of Property.
Title
To Adopt Federal Law Concerning Income Tax Deductions For Depreciation And The Expensing Of Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-27 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-04-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-19 | House | Filed |