AR HB1776 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-8-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that HB1776 is now Act 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Modernize And Strengthen Nursing Facility Staffing Standards And Reporting Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Modernize And Strengthen Nursing Facility Staffing Standards And Reporting Requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseNotification that HB1776 is now Act 715
2021-04-13HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-12HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-12HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-12SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-07SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-05SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback